LA HB460 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-13 - Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first and second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
Pending: Senate Judiciary B Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes a special treasury fund for purposes of drug testing and treatment of recipients of certain public assistance (RE NO IMPACT GF RV See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes a special treasury fund for purposes of drug testing and treatment of recipients of certain public assistance (RE NO IMPACT GF RV See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-06-13 - House - House Vote on HB 460, FINAL PASSAGE (#552) (Y: 57 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - House - House Vote on HB 460, FINAL PASSAGE (#391) (Y: 48 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - House - House Vote on HB 460, TABLE SUBJECT MATTER (#389) (Y: 36 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [FAIL]
2011-06-02 - House - House Vote on HB 460, AMENDMENT # 185 BY BARROW, MOTION TO ADOPT (#388) (Y: 38 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [FAIL]
2011-06-02 - House - House Vote on HB 460, AMENDMENT # 184 BY SMITH, P., MOTION TO ADOPT (#387) (Y: 57 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 28) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-06-13 Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first and second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
2011-06-13 Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 57, nays 31. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2011-06-13 Called from the calendar.
2011-06-09 Scheduled for floor debate on 6/13/2011.
2011-06-09 Notice given.
2011-06-08 Scheduled for floor debate on 6/9/2011.
2011-06-08 Notice given.
2011-06-06 Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules.
2011-06-02 Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 48, nays 34. Failed to pass, motion to reconsider pending.
2011-05-24 Scheduled for floor debate on 6/2/2011.
2011-05-24 Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
2011-05-23 Reported favorably (17-3) (Regular).
2011-04-25 Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
2011-04-18 First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/18/2011.
2011-04-15 Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
2011-04-15 Prefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback