LA HB459 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-28 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
Pending: Senate Health & Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-28 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
Pending: Senate Health & Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Enacts the Life-Sustaining Care Act (RE INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Title
Enacts the Life-Sustaining Care Act (RE INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-26 - House - House Vote on HB 459 FINAL PASSAGE (#477) (Y: 92 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-28 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2022-04-26 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 92, nays 3. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2022-04-26 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2022-04-25 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/26/2022. |
2022-04-25 | House | Notice given. |
2022-04-25 | House | Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar. |
2022-04-20 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/25/2022. |
2022-04-18 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-04-13 | House | Reported with amendments (15-0). |
2022-03-14 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2022-03-04 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2022. |
2022-03-03 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2022-03-03 | House | Prefiled. |