LA HB459 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-26 - Effective date: 08/01/17.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-26 - Effective date: 08/01/17.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Creates and provides for a task force on coordination of Medicaid fraud detection and prevention initiatives (EN SEE FISC NOTE SD EX See Note)
Title
Creates and provides for a task force on coordination of Medicaid fraud detection and prevention initiatives (EN SEE FISC NOTE SD EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-06 - House - House Vote on HB 459 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#837) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-06-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 459 FINAL PASSAGE (#741) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - House - House Vote on HB 459 FINAL PASSAGE (#337) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-06-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 459 FINAL PASSAGE (#741) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - House - House Vote on HB 459 FINAL PASSAGE (#337) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-26 | House | Effective date: 08/01/17. |
2017-06-26 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 420. |
2017-06-07 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2017-06-07 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2017-06-06 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 95, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2017-06-05 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 06/06/17. |
2017-06-04 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2017-06-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 31 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2017-05-17 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2017-05-11 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/17/17. |
2017-05-11 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2017-05-10 | House | Reported with amendments (9-0). |
2017-04-10 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2017-03-31 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2017-03-31 | House | Prefiled. |