LA HB457 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-20 - Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-20 - Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to school membership in associations that prescribe eligibility to participate in athletics
Title
Provides relative to school membership in associations that prescribe eligibility to participate in athletics
Sponsors
Sen. Kirk Talbot [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-19 - House - House Vote on HB 457 FINAL PASSAGE (#402) (Y: 50 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-20 | House | Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules. |
2015-05-19 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 50, nays 44. Failed to pass, motion to reconsider pending. |
2015-05-14 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/19/2015. |
2015-05-11 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2015-05-07 | House | Reported with amendments (10-6). |
2015-04-13 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. |
2015-04-02 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education. |
2015-04-02 | House | Prefiled. |