LA HB457 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-17 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-17 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the dedication of certain monies within the Millennium Trust for the TOPS program (EG SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)
Title
Provides for the dedication of certain monies within the Millennium Trust for the TOPS program (EG SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Rep. Jane Smith [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-17 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | |
2011-05-11 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/17/2011. | |
2011-05-11 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2011-05-10 | Reported with amendments (18-0) (Regular). | |
2011-04-25 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. | |
2011-04-18 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/18/2011. | |
2011-04-15 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Appropriations. | |
2011-04-15 | Prefiled. |