LA HB455 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-05-25 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
Pending: Senate Health & Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes recommendation of medical marijuana by physicians for patients in hospice or palliative care

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes recommendation of medical marijuana by physicians for patients in hospice or palliative care

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-21 - House - House Vote on HB 455 FINAL PASSAGE (#276) (Y: 80 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-25SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2020-05-22SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2020-05-21HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 80, nays 10. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2020-05-21HouseCalled from the calendar.
2020-05-21HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2020-05-20HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/21/20.
2020-05-15HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2020-05-13HouseReported favorably (10-0).
2020-03-09HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2020-02-27HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2020-02-27HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback