LA HB455 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-6-2)
Status: Passed on June 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-11 - Effective date: 08/01/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-6-2)
Status: Passed on June 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-11 - Effective date: 08/01/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to autonomous commercial motor vehicles (EN SEE FISC NOTE SD EX See Note)
Title
Provides relative to autonomous commercial motor vehicles (EN SEE FISC NOTE SD EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-04 - House - House Vote on HB 455 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#960) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 455 FINAL PASSAGE (#884) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - House Vote on HB 455 FINAL PASSAGE (#573) (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 455 FINAL PASSAGE (#884) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - House Vote on HB 455 FINAL PASSAGE (#573) (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-11 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2019. |
2019-06-11 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 232. |
2019-06-05 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2019-06-05 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2019-06-04 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 98, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2019-06-03 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 06/04/19. |
2019-06-03 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 1 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2019-05-23 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 86, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2019-05-23 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2019-05-23 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2019-05-21 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/23/19. |
2019-05-21 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2019-05-21 | House | Discharged from the Committee on Appropriations. |
2019-05-07 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2019-05-06 | House | Reported with amendments (14-2). |
2019-04-08 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2019-03-29 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2019-03-29 | House | Prefiled. |