LA HB452 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Passed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - Effective date: See Act.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Creates a domestic violence fatality review team within the Louisiana Department of Health (EN +$160,823 GF EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creates a domestic violence fatality review team within the Louisiana Department of Health (EN +$160,823 GF EX See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-08 - House - House Vote on HB 452 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1118) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 452 FINAL PASSAGE (#959) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - House - House Vote on HB 452 FINAL PASSAGE (#718) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-14HouseEffective date: See Act.
2021-06-14HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 320.
2021-06-11HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2021-06-09SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2021-06-09HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2021-06-08HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 99, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
2021-06-07HouseScheduled for concurrence on 06/08/2021.
2021-06-07HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2021-06-07SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2021-06-07SenateRules suspended. Called from the Calendar.
2021-06-07SenateRead by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
2021-06-07SenateRules suspended.
2021-06-06SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2021-06-06SenateReported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2021-06-02SenateRules suspended. Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
2021-05-27SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2021-05-26SenateReceived in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2021-05-26HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 101, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2021-05-25HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/26/2021.
2021-05-25HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2021-05-24HouseReported favorably (15-0).
2021-05-13HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
2021-05-12HouseReported with amendments (12-0).
2021-04-29HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
2021-04-28HouseReported favorably (14-0. To be recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
2021-04-12HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2021-04-02HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/2/2021.
2021-04-02HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2021-04-02HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=21rs&b=HB452&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1211478
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1218233
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1224112
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1228512
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1233625
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1235636
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1222874
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1224017
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1224410
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1224738
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1227754
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1230847
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1230609
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1232895
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1232624
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1211494
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1217734
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1218606
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1219658
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1224373
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1227200
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1228776
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1230114
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1231149
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1231254
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1232234
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1233264
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1235340
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1237294
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1228474
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1232930
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1233440

Bill Comments

feedback