LA HB451 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-14 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-14 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the State Board of Elementary and Secondary Education to consider the potential fiscal impact on the local school system when reviewing a Type 2 charter school proposal
Title
Requires the State Board of Elementary and Secondary Education to consider the potential fiscal impact on the local school system when reviewing a Type 2 charter school proposal
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. |
2022-03-04 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2022. |
2022-03-03 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education. |
2022-03-03 | House | Prefiled. |