LA HB45 | 2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-23 - Effective date: 08/01/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to the certification of Montessori teachers

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to the certification of Montessori teachers

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-05-13 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 45 FINAL PASSAGE (#652) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - House - House Vote on HB 45 FINAL PASSAGE (#224) (Y: 100 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-05-23HouseEffective date: 08/01/2024.
2024-05-23HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 186.
2024-05-16HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2024-05-16SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2024-05-15HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2024-05-14HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2024-05-13SenateRules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2024-05-07SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2024-05-06SenateRead by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2024-05-01SenateRules suspended. Reported favorably.
2024-04-08SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
2024-04-03SenateReceived in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2024-04-03HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 100, nays 4. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2024-04-02HouseScheduled for floor debate on 04/03/2024.
2024-04-02HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2024-03-27HouseReported favorably (13-0).
2024-03-11HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
2024-02-02HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/2/2024.
2024-01-29HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education.
2024-01-29HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback