LA HB449 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-08 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
Pending: House Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-08 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
Pending: House Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for a time-limited expansion of Medicaid eligibility standards in La. to conform such standards to those provided in the Affordable Care Act until Dec. 31, 2016 (OR DECREASE GF EX See Note)
Title
Provides for a time-limited expansion of Medicaid eligibility standards in La. to conform such standards to those provided in the Affordable Care Act until Dec. 31, 2016 (OR DECREASE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Rep. Roy Burrell [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-08 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2013-04-01 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/1/2013. |
2013-03-29 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2013-03-29 | House | Prefiled. |