LA HB447 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-17 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
Pending: Senate Health & Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-17 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
Pending: Senate Health & Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to employment in intermediate care facilities on nonlicensed persons convicted of certain offenses
Title
Provides relative to employment in intermediate care facilities on nonlicensed persons convicted of certain offenses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-12 - House - House Vote on HB 447 FINAL PASSAGE (#415) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-17 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2021-05-12 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 99, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2021-05-06 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/12/2021. |
2021-05-06 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2021-05-05 | House | Reported with amendments (10-0). |
2021-04-12 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2021-04-02 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/2/2021. |
2021-04-02 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2021-04-02 | House | Prefiled. |