LA HB447 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-11 - Effective date: August 1, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-11 - Effective date: August 1, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Removes antiquated references to the Riverboat Gaming Commission
Title
Removes antiquated references to the Riverboat Gaming Commission
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-03 - House - House Vote on HB 447, ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (#1540) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2012-05-31 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 447, ADOPT (#1607) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-05-14 - House - House Vote on HB 447, REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#809) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2012-05-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 447, FINAL PASSAGE (#641) (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-04-04 - House - House Vote on HB 447, FINAL PASSAGE (#216) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-05-31 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 447, ADOPT (#1607) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-05-14 - House - House Vote on HB 447, REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#809) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2012-05-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 447, FINAL PASSAGE (#641) (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-04-04 - House - House Vote on HB 447, FINAL PASSAGE (#216) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-11 | Effective date: August 1, 2012. | |
2012-06-11 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 711. | |
2012-06-04 | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. | |
2012-06-04 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2012-06-04 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2012-06-03 | Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report. | |
2012-06-03 | Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 93, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted. | |
2012-06-01 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/3/2012. | |
2012-05-31 | Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report. | |
2012-05-31 | Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays. | |
2012-05-30 | Conference committee report received. | |
2012-05-30 | Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules. | |
2012-05-23 | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. | |
2012-05-23 | Senate conference committee members appointed: Morrell, Martiny, and Crowe. | |
2012-05-17 | Notice House Conference Committee members appointed. | |
2012-05-17 | House conferees appointed: Lopinto, Moreno, and Honore. | |
2012-05-14 | Notice House rejected the Senate amendments. | |
2012-05-14 | Read by title, roll called, yeas 92, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending. | |
2012-05-07 | Scheduled for concurrence on 5/14/2012. | |
2012-05-01 | Received from the Senate with amendments. | |
2012-05-01 | Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 32 yeas and 1 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2012-04-26 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2012-04-25 | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2012-04-24 | Reported favorably. | |
2012-04-09 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. | |
2012-04-04 | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | |
2012-04-04 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |
2012-03-29 | Scheduled for floor debate on 4/4/2012. | |
2012-03-29 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2012-03-28 | Reported favorably (12-0) (Regular). | |
2012-03-12 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. | |
2012-03-03 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/2/2012. | |
2012-02-29 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. | |
2012-02-29 | Prefiled. |