LA HB447 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-08 - Effective date: See Act.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-08 - Effective date: See Act.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to certificates of insurance (EN INCREASE SG EX See Note)
Title
Provides relative to certificates of insurance (EN INCREASE SG EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Vote on HB 447, ADOPT (#2012) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 447, MOTION TO ADOPT (#1916) (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 20 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 447, REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1208) (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on HB 447, FINAL PASSAGE (#913) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 447, FINAL PASSAGE (#641) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 447, MOTION TO ADOPT (#1916) (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 20 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 447, REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1208) (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on HB 447, FINAL PASSAGE (#913) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 447, FINAL PASSAGE (#641) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-08 | Effective date: See Act. | |
2010-07-08 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 1017. | |
2010-06-23 | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. | |
2010-06-21 | Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/23. | |
2010-06-21 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2010-06-21 | Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report. | |
2010-06-21 | Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. | |
2010-06-21 | Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report. | |
2010-06-21 | Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 85, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted. | |
2010-06-20 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/21/2010. | |
2010-06-16 | Conference committee report received. | |
2010-06-16 | Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules. | |
2010-06-16 | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. | |
2010-06-15 | Senate conference committee members appointed: Hebert, Long, and Riser. | |
2010-06-11 | Notice House Conference Committee members appointed. | |
2010-06-11 | House conferees appointed: Pearson, Kleckley, and Arnold. | |
2010-06-07 | Notice House rejected Senate amendments. | |
2010-06-07 | Read by title, roll called, yeas 89, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending. | |
2010-06-04 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/7/2010. | |
2010-06-02 | Received from the Senate with amendments. | |
2010-06-01 | Rules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2010-05-24 | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2010-05-20 | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2010-05-19 | Reported with amendments. | |
2010-05-11 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Insurance. | |
2010-05-10 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | |
2010-05-06 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |
2010-04-29 | Scheduled for floor debate on May 6, 2010. | |
2010-04-29 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2010-04-28 | Reported with amendments (10-0) (Regular). | |
2010-03-29 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Insurance. | |
2010-03-19 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/19/2010. | |
2010-03-15 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Insurance. | |
2010-03-15 | Prefiled. |