LA HB446 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 27 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for a voucher program for certain public school students (RE +$46,617,900 GF EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for a voucher program for certain public school students (RE +$46,617,900 GF EX See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-23 - House - House Vote on HB 446 FINAL PASSAGE (#561) (Y: 85 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-30SenateRead by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
2019-05-30SenateRules suspended. Recalled from Committee.
2019-05-28SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
2019-05-27SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2019-05-23HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 85, nays 1. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2019-05-21HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/23/19.
2019-05-21HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-05-20HouseReported favorably (18-0).
2019-05-08HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
2019-05-07HouseReported favorably (9-0).
2019-04-08HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
2019-03-29HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education.
2019-03-29HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=19rs&b=HB446&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1121715
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1131951
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1137273
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1137209
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1121734
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1123345
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1132316
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1132368
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1137423
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1137326
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1137255

Bill Comments

feedback