LA HB446 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-07 - Effective date: August 15, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-07 - Effective date: August 15, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Limits applicability of insurance cancellation requirements
Title
Limits applicability of insurance cancellation requirements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-24 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 446, FINAL PASSAGE (#268) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-05-11 - House - House Vote on HB 446, FINAL PASSAGE (#107) (Y: 73 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2011-05-11 - House - House Vote on HB 446, FINAL PASSAGE (#107) (Y: 73 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-07 | Effective date: August 15, 2011. | |
2011-06-07 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 21. | |
2011-05-31 | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. | |
2011-05-31 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2011-05-25 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2011-05-24 | Received from the Senate without amendments. | |
2011-05-24 | Read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2011-05-23 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2011-05-19 | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2011-05-18 | Reported favorably. | |
2011-05-16 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Insurance. | |
2011-05-12 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | |
2011-05-11 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 73, nays 16. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |
2011-05-05 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/11/2011. | |
2011-05-05 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2011-05-04 | Reported favorably (8-0) (Regular). | |
2011-04-25 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Insurance. | |
2011-04-18 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/18/2011. | |
2011-04-15 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Insurance. | |
2011-04-15 | Prefiled. |