LA HB444 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-14 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
Pending: House Administration of Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-14 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
Pending: House Administration of Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adds private residences conducting approved home study programs to the crime of unlawful residence or presence of sexual predator
Title
Adds private residences conducting approved home study programs to the crime of unlawful residence or presence of sexual predator
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-14 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2016-03-04 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2016. |
2016-03-03 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2016-03-03 | House | Prefiled. |