LA HB442 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 29-9-1)
Status: Passed on June 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-05 - Effective date: 06/05/20.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 29-9-1)
Status: Passed on June 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-05 - Effective date: 06/05/20.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to timber harvest season permits
Title
Provides relative to timber harvest season permits
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-26 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 442 FINAL PASSAGE (#365) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-05-15 - House - House Vote on HB 442 ADD CO-AUTHORS (#51) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 67) [PASS]
2020-05-15 - House - House Vote on HB 442 FINAL PASSAGE (#50) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-05-15 - House - House Vote on HB 442 ADD CO-AUTHORS (#51) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 67) [PASS]
2020-05-15 - House - House Vote on HB 442 FINAL PASSAGE (#50) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-05 | House | Effective date: 06/05/20. |
2020-06-05 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 84. |
2020-06-01 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2020-05-31 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2020-05-27 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2020-05-27 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2020-05-26 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2020-05-22 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2020-05-18 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2020-05-15 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2020-05-13 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/15/20. |
2020-05-13 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2020-05-07 | House | Reported favorably (14-0). |
2020-03-09 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2020-02-27 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2020-02-27 | House | Prefiled. |