LA HB441 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

(Constitutional Amendment) Provides for a flat tax on individual income and eliminates the income tax deduction for federal income taxes paid for purposes of computing individual, estate and trust, and corporate income taxes (RE NO IMPACT GF RV See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

(Constitutional Amendment) Provides for a flat tax on individual income and eliminates the income tax deduction for federal income taxes paid for purposes of computing individual, estate and trust, and corporate income taxes (RE NO IMPACT GF RV See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-20 - House - House Vote on HB 441 FINAL PASSAGE (#399) (Y: 53 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-21HouseRead by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules.
2019-05-20HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 53, nays 32. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass. Motion to reconsider pending.
2019-05-20HouseRules suspended, called out of its regular order.
2019-05-07HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/20/19.
2019-05-07HouseRead by title, amended, ordered reengrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-05-06HouseReported with amendments (6-0).
2019-04-30HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
2019-04-29HouseReported with amendments (11-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
2019-04-08HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
2019-03-29HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
2019-03-29HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=19rs&b=HB441&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1121695
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1128708
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1131423
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1128342
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1128154
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1130763
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1131047
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1131362
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1121721
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1128055
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1128831
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1129165
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1131669
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1132076
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1135642

Bill Comments

feedback