LA HB44 | 2020 | 1st Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Enacts the Omnibus Premium Reduction Act of 2020 (Item #40) (RE SEE FISC NOTE GF EX)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enacts the Omnibus Premium Reduction Act of 2020 (Item #40) (RE SEE FISC NOTE GF EX)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-29 - House - House Vote on HB 44 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#167) (Y: 72 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-06-26 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 44 FINAL PASSAGE (#127) (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - House - House Vote on HB 44 FINAL PASSAGE (#34) (Y: 74 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-30HouseNotice of Senate conferees appointed.
2020-06-30SenateSenate conference committee members appointed: Peacock, McMath, and Harris.
2020-06-30SenateNotice House Conference Committee members appointed.
2020-06-30SenateNotice House rejected the Senate amendments.
2020-06-29HouseHouse conferees appointed: Garofalo, Gregory Miller, and Seabaugh.
2020-06-29HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 72, nays 26, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
2020-06-29HouseCalled from the calendar.
2020-06-29HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2020-06-28HouseScheduled for concurrence on 06/29/20.
2020-06-28HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2020-06-26SenateRules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 27 yeas and 9 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2020-06-25SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2020-06-25SenateReported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2020-06-15SenateReceived in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
2020-06-15HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 74, nays 25. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2020-06-10HouseScheduled for floor debate on 06/15/20.
2020-06-10HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2020-06-09HouseReported with amendments (9-4-1).
2020-06-05HouseRead by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=201ES&b=HB44&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1180094
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1180902
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1182242
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1180861
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1180699
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1181287
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1184038
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1183744
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1184294
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1184592
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1184983
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1180095
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1180943
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1182268
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1183923
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1184211
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1182246
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1184398

Bill Comments

feedback