LA HB439 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-27 - Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 31, nays 59. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-27 - Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 31, nays 59. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes public postsecondary education management boards to increase tuition and provides for limitations and exceptions (EG INCREASE SG RV See Note)
Title
Authorizes public postsecondary education management boards to increase tuition and provides for limitations and exceptions (EG INCREASE SG RV See Note)
Sponsors
Rep. Barry Ivey [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-27 - House - House Vote on HB 439 FINAL PASSAGE (#501) (Y: 31 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-27 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 31, nays 59. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass. |
2016-04-21 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/27/2016. |
2016-04-21 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2016-04-20 | House | Reported favorably (8-4). |
2016-03-14 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. |
2016-03-04 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2016. |
2016-03-03 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education. |
2016-03-03 | House | Prefiled. |