LA HB438 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-21 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes a custodian to require a requestor of a public record to provide sufficient proof of identity

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes a custodian to require a requestor of a public record to provide sufficient proof of identity

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-07 - House - House Vote on HB 438 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1026) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 438 FINAL PASSAGE (#686) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - House - House Vote on HB 438 FINAL PASSAGE (#374) (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-21HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2021-07-20HouseVeto message read. Lies over under the rules.
2021-07-01HouseVetoed by the Governor.
2021-06-11HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2021-06-09SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2021-06-08HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2021-06-07HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 97, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
2021-06-07HouseCalled from the calendar.
2021-06-07HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2021-06-03HouseScheduled for concurrence on 06/07/2021.
2021-06-03HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2021-06-02SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2021-05-24SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2021-05-20SenateCommittee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2021-05-19SenateReported with amendments.
2021-05-13SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
2021-05-12SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2021-05-11HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 99, nays 1. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2021-05-06HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/11/2021.
2021-05-05HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2021-05-04HouseReported with amendments (12-0).
2021-04-12HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
2021-04-02HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/2/2021.
2021-04-01HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
2021-04-01HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=21rs&b=HB438&sbi=y
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1211078
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1220557
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1223615
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1232533
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1220304
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1220506
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1220858
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1226073
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1226042
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1226094
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1211084
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1220608
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1223688
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1226185
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1227405
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1231459
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1236625
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1238095
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1223542
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1231015
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1232441

Bill Comments

feedback