LA HB435 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-16 - Effective date: 08/01/17.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requires a healthcare facility to provide notice of balance billing

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires a healthcare facility to provide notice of balance billing

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-04 - House - House Vote on HB 435 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#709) (Y: 100 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 435 FINAL PASSAGE (#587) (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 435 AMENDMENT # 2601 BY CLAITOR HB 435 BY TALBOT (#586) (Y: 7 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 435 AMENDMENT # 2625 BY MORRISH HB 435 BY TALBOT (#585) (Y: 5 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2017-05-11 - House - House Vote on HB 435 FINAL PASSAGE (#277) (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-16HouseEffective date: 08/01/17.
2017-06-16HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 306.
2017-06-06HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2017-06-06SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2017-06-05HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2017-06-04HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 100, nays 1, Senate amendments concurred in.
2017-06-01HouseScheduled for concurrence on 06/04/17.
2017-05-31HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2017-05-31SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 1 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2017-05-30SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2017-05-25SenateRead by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2017-05-25SenateRules suspended.
2017-05-24SenateReported favorably.
2017-05-16SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Insurance.
2017-05-15SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2017-05-11HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 92, nays 1. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2017-05-04HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/11/17.
2017-05-03HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2017-05-02HouseReported with amendments (10-1).
2017-04-10HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Insurance.
2017-03-31HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Insurance.
2017-03-31HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=17rs&b=HB435&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1030780
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1037798
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1048462
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1051916
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1037228
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1037737
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1037431
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1046635
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1046594
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1046554
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1046417
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1046634
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1046632
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1046845
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1048311
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1030814
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1038150
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1055598
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1040962
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1046637

Bill Comments

feedback