LA HB435 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-07 - Effective date: June 7, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides that certain military veterans shall be considered residents of Louisiana for tuition purposes at public institutions of postsecondary education

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides that certain military veterans shall be considered residents of Louisiana for tuition purposes at public institutions of postsecondary education

Sponsors

Rep. Neil Abramson [D]Rep. Bryan Adams [R]Rep. John Anders [D]Rep. James Armes [D]
Rep. Jeffery Arnold [D]Rep. Austin Badon [D]Rep. Taylor Barras [R]Sen. Regina Barrow [D]
Rep. John Berthelot [R]Rep. Robert Billiot [D]Rep. Stuart Bishop [R]Sen. Wesley Bishop [D]
Rep. Christopher Broadwater [R]Rep. Jared Brossett [D]Rep. Terry Brown [I]Rep. Richard Burford [R]
Rep. Henry Burns [R]Rep. Timothy Burns [R]Rep. Roy Burrell [D]Rep. Thomas Carmody [R]
Rep. Stephen Carter [R]Rep. Simone Champagne [R]Rep. Charles Chaney [R]Rep. Patrick Connick [R]
Rep. Kenny Cox [D]Rep. George Cromer [R]Rep. Michael Danahay [D]Rep. Herbert Dixon [D]
Rep. Gordon Dove [R]Rep. John Edwards [D]Sen. James Fannin [R]Rep. Franklin Foil [R]
Rep. A.B. Franklin [D]Rep. Randal Gaines [D]Rep. Raymond Garofalo [R]Rep. Brett Geymann [R]
Rep. Jerry Gisclair [D]Rep. Hunter Greene [R]Rep. Mickey Guillory [D]Rep. John Guinn [R]
Rep. Lance Harris [R]Rep. Joseph Harrison [R]Rep. Kenneth Havard [R]Rep. Lowell Hazel [R]
Rep. Cameron Henry [R]Sen. Bob Hensgens [R]Rep. Dorothy Hill [D]Rep. Valarie Hodges [R]
Rep. Frank Hoffmann [R]Rep. Paul Hollis [R]Rep. Dalton Honore [D]Rep. Frank Howard [R]
Rep. Marcus Hunter [D]Rep. Mike Huval [R]Rep. Girod Jackson [D]Rep. Katrina Jackson [D]
Rep. Edward James [D]Rep. Patrick Jefferson [D]Rep. Robert Johnson [D]Rep. Sam Jones [D]
Rep. Charles Kleckley [R]Sen. Eddie Lambert [R]Rep. Nancy Landry [R]Rep. Terry Landry [D]
Rep. Bernard LeBas [D]Rep. Walt Leger [D]Rep. Christopher Leopold [R]Rep. Anthony Ligi [R]
Rep. Joseph Lopinto [R]Rep. Nicholas Lorusso [R]Rep. Sherman Mack [R]Rep. Gregory Miller [R]
Rep. Jack Montoucet [D]Rep. Helena Moreno [D]Rep. James Morris [R]Rep. John Morris [R]
Rep. Barbara Norton [D]Rep. Stephen Ortego [D]Rep. Kevin Pearson [R]Rep. Vincent Pierre [D]
Rep. Erich Ponti [R]Rep. Rogers Pope [R]Sen. Edward Price [D]Rep. Stephen Pugh [R]
Rep. Steve Pylant [R]Rep. Eugene Reynolds [D]Rep. Jerome Richard [I]Rep. Clifton Richardson [R]
Rep. Harold Ritchie [D]Rep. Clay Schexnayder [R]Rep. John Schroder [R]Rep. Alan Seabaugh [R]
Rep. Robert Shadoin [R]Rep. Scott Simon [R]Sen. John Smith [R]Rep. Patricia Smith [D]
Rep. Karen St Germain [D]Rep. Kirk Talbot [R]Rep. Major Thibaut [D]Rep. Ledricka Thierry [D]
Rep. Jeff Thompson [R]Rep. Lenar Whitney [R]Rep. Alfred Williams [D]Rep. Patrick Williams [D]
Rep. Thomas Willmott [R]

Roll Calls

2012-05-24 - House - House Vote on HB 435, CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1206) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-05-16 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 435, FINAL PASSAGE (#1087) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-04-04 - House - House Vote on HB 435, FINAL PASSAGE (#214) (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-06-07 Effective date: June 7, 2012.
2012-06-07 Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 581.
2012-05-30 Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
2012-05-29 Signed by the President of the Senate.
2012-05-29 Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2012-05-24 Read by title, roll called, yeas 95, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
2012-05-22 Scheduled for floor debate on 5/24/2012.
2012-05-17 Received from the Senate with amendments.
2012-05-16 The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2012-05-15 Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2012-05-14 Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2012-04-10 Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
2012-04-09 Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2012-04-04 Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 104, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2012-03-29 Scheduled for floor debate on 4/4/2012.
2012-03-29 Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
2012-03-28 Reported with amendments (14-0) (Regular).
2012-03-12 Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
2012-03-03 First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/2/2012.
2012-02-29 Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education.
2012-02-29 Prefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback