LA HB433 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Introduced on April 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-12 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
Pending: House Administration of Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-12 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
Pending: House Administration of Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to sexual assault collection kits (OR +$222,834 GF EX See Note)
Title
Provides relative to sexual assault collection kits (OR +$222,834 GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Rep. Pat Moore [D] | Rep. Barbara Carpenter [D] | Rep. Tanner Magee [R] | Rep. Tammy Phelps [D] |
Rep. Malinda White [R] | Sen. Katrina Jackson-Andrews [D] | Sen. Beth Mizell [R] | Sen. Karen Peterson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-12 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2021-04-02 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/2/2021. |
2021-04-01 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2021-04-01 | House | Prefiled. |