LA HB432 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-25 - Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-25 - Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes lane use requirements for certain motor vehicles on interstate highways
Title
Establishes lane use requirements for certain motor vehicles on interstate highways
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-25 | House | Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar. |
2018-04-19 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/25/18. |
2018-04-17 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-04-16 | House | Reported with amendments (7-5). |
2018-04-04 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2018-04-03 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |
2018-03-02 | House | Prefiled. To be introduced at a later date. |