LA HB430 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Rules suspended. Reported favorably.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Rules suspended. Reported favorably.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the office of motor vehicles to accept proof of vehicle insurance from another state
Title
Requires the office of motor vehicles to accept proof of vehicle insurance from another state
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-25 - House - House Vote on HB 430 FINAL PASSAGE (#84) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-03-25 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 101, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-03-21 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 03/25/2024. |
2024-03-21 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-03-20 | House | Reported favorably (9-0). |
2024-03-11 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2024-02-29 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2024-02-29 | House | Prefiled. |