LA HB430 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-14 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-14 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the governor to review all cooperative endeavor agreements with the Saints and Pelicans and authorizes him to renegotiate such agreements
Title
Requires the governor to review all cooperative endeavor agreements with the Saints and Pelicans and authorizes him to renegotiate such agreements
Sponsors
Rep. Terry Brown [I] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-14 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2016-03-04 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2016. |
2016-03-03 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2016-03-03 | House | Prefiled. |