LA HB43 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-07 - Effective date: 07/01/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes the governing authority of the city of New Orleans to levy a tax on short term rentals of overnight lodging (EN +$10,500,000 LF RV See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes the governing authority of the city of New Orleans to levy a tax on short term rentals of overnight lodging (EN +$10,500,000 LF RV See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 43 FINAL PASSAGE (#594) (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - House Vote on HB 43 FINAL PASSAGE (#234) (Y: 70 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-07HouseEffective date: 07/01/2019.
2019-06-07HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 169.
2019-06-02HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2019-05-31SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2019-05-31HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2019-05-30HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2019-05-30SenateRules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 31 yeas and 1 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2019-05-29SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2019-05-28SenateRead by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2019-05-27SenateRules suspended. Reported favorably.
2019-05-21SenateRead by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
2019-05-20SenateReported favorably.
2019-05-13SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
2019-05-09SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2019-05-08HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 70, nays 18. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2019-05-06HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/08/19.
2019-05-06HouseRules suspended, called out of its regular order.
2019-05-06HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-05-02HouseReported with amendments (12-0).
2019-04-08HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
2019-03-08HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/8/2019.
2019-03-06HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
2019-03-06HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=19rs&b=HB43&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1114262
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1130552
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1132802
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1139675
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1143877
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1129115
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1130537
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1131822
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1132203
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1114266
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1119426
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1130871
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1130703
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1132837
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1133138
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1140332
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1146321
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1132786
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1139566

Bill Comments

feedback