LA HB43 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-10 - Withdrawn prior to introduction.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-10 - Withdrawn prior to introduction.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits the possession of imitation firearms, projectiles, or ammunition on or within a certain distance of school property or at school-sponsored functions (OR SEE FISC NOTE LF EX)
Title
Prohibits the possession of imitation firearms, projectiles, or ammunition on or within a certain distance of school property or at school-sponsored functions (OR SEE FISC NOTE LF EX)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-10 | House | Withdrawn prior to introduction. |
2017-03-10 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/10/2017. |
2017-03-06 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2017-03-06 | House | Prefiled. |