LA HB43 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-12 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Retirement.
Pending: House Retirement Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-12 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Retirement.
Pending: House Retirement Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the forfeiture of pension benefits by public officials upon felony conviction for certain offenses
Title
Provides relative to the forfeiture of pension benefits by public officials upon felony conviction for certain offenses
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-12 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Retirement. | |
2012-01-30 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 1/30/2012. | |
2012-01-27 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Retirement. | |
2012-01-27 | Prefiled. |
Subjects
Louisiana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.la.us/billdata/byinst.asp?sessionid=12rs&billid=HB43 |
Text | https://www.legis.state.la.us/billdata/streamdocument.asp?did=767971 |