LA HB429 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-5)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-14 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-14 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the creation of cooperative economic development districts affiliated with Louisiana public postsecondary education institutions (EG SEE FISC NOTE SD RV See Note)
Title
Authorizes the creation of cooperative economic development districts affiliated with Louisiana public postsecondary education institutions (EG SEE FISC NOTE SD RV See Note)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-14 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2019-05-14 | House | Notice removed |
2019-05-07 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/14/19. |
2019-05-07 | House | Notice given. |
2019-05-07 | House | Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar. |
2019-05-02 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/07/19. |
2019-04-29 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2019-04-25 | House | Reported with amendments (13-0). |
2019-04-08 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. |
2019-03-29 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. |
2019-03-29 | House | Prefiled. |