LA HB428 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-22 - Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

(Constitutional Amendment) Extends the jurisdiction of the Board of Tax Appeals to matters concerning the constitutionality of taxes and fees (RR1 SEE FISC NOTE GF EX)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

(Constitutional Amendment) Extends the jurisdiction of the Board of Tax Appeals to matters concerning the constitutionality of taxes and fees (RR1 SEE FISC NOTE GF EX)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-13 - House - House Vote on HB 428 FINAL PASSAGE (#252) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-22SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2019-05-21SenateCommittee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2019-05-20SenateReported with amendments.
2019-05-15SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
2019-05-14SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2019-05-13HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2019-05-02HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/13/19.
2019-05-01HouseRead by title, amended, ordered reengrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-04-30HouseReported with amendments (7-0).
2019-04-29HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
2019-04-25HouseReported with amendments (11-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
2019-04-08HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
2019-03-29HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
2019-03-29HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=19rs&b=HB428&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1121655
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1127749
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1129190
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1133602
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1125730
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1127644
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1129118
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1128787
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1132548
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1133211
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1135297
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1136480
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1121664
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1127409
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1127949
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1129308
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1129369
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1130746
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1133671
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1134550
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1135737
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1133492

Bill Comments

feedback