LA HB426 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-18 - Conference Committee Report read; failed to be adopted by a vote of 5 yeas and 21 nays.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-18 - Conference Committee Report read; failed to be adopted by a vote of 5 yeas and 21 nays.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the transfer of state property in St. Martin Parish
Title
Authorizes the transfer of state property in St. Martin Parish
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Huval [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-18 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 426 ADOPT (#1406) (Y: 5 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [FAIL]
2018-05-18 - House - House Vote on HB 426 CCR with NEW MATTER (#1390) (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - House - House Vote on HB 426 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#760) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 426 FINAL PASSAGE (#582) (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - House - House Vote on HB 426 FINAL PASSAGE (#180) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-05-18 - House - House Vote on HB 426 CCR with NEW MATTER (#1390) (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - House - House Vote on HB 426 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#760) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 426 FINAL PASSAGE (#582) (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - House - House Vote on HB 426 FINAL PASSAGE (#180) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-18 | Senate | Conference Committee Report read; failed to be adopted by a vote of 5 yeas and 21 nays. |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report. |
2018-05-18 | House | Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 89, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted. |
2018-05-18 | House | Rules suspended. |
2018-05-18 | House | Conference Committee report received. |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Notice House recommitted the report to the Conference Committee. |
2018-05-18 | House | Notice Senate recommitted the report to the Conference Committee. |
2018-05-18 | House | The House recommitted the report to Conference Committee. |
2018-05-18 | Senate | The Senate recommitted the report to the Conference Committee. |
2018-05-17 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/18/18. |
2018-05-17 | House | Notice given. |
2018-05-17 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2018-05-16 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/17/18. |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Conference committee report received. |
2018-05-14 | House | Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules. |
2018-05-09 | House | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Senate conference committee members appointed: Chabert, Mills, and Carter. |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Notice House Conference Committee members appointed. |
2018-05-08 | House | House conferees appointed: Huval, Bishop, and Hensgens. |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Notice House rejected the Senate amendments. |
2018-05-07 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 92, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending. |
2018-04-27 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 05/07/18. |
2018-04-26 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Rules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 29 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources. |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2018-03-29 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 92, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2018-03-22 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 03/29/18. |
2018-03-22 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-03-21 | House | Reported with amendments (13-0). |
2018-03-12 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. |
2018-03-02 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. |
2018-03-01 | House | Prefiled. |