LA HB425 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-12 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-12 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
(Constitutional Amendment) Increases the number of associate supreme court justices and increases the required number of justices concurring in order to render judgment (OR SEE FISC NOTE GF EX)
Title
(Constitutional Amendment) Increases the number of associate supreme court justices and increases the required number of justices concurring in order to render judgment (OR SEE FISC NOTE GF EX)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-12 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary. |
2021-04-02 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/2/2021. |
2021-04-01 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary. |
2021-04-01 | House | Prefiled. |