LA HB425 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-11 - Effective date: 08/01/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-11 - Effective date: 08/01/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Revises membership and provides relative to powers and duties of the Louisiana Fire and Emergency Training Commission
Title
Revises membership and provides relative to powers and duties of the Louisiana Fire and Emergency Training Commission
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-29 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 425 FINAL PASSAGE (#532) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-05-22 - House - House Vote on HB 425 FINAL PASSAGE (#361) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-05-22 - House - House Vote on HB 425 FINAL PASSAGE (#361) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-11 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2020. |
2020-06-11 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 268. |
2020-06-02 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2020-05-31 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2020-05-29 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2020-05-29 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2020-05-29 | Senate | Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2020-05-28 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2020-05-28 | Senate | Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2020-05-25 | Senate | Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education. |
2020-05-22 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2020-05-21 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/22/20. |
2020-05-21 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2020-05-20 | House | Reported with amendments (11-0). |
2020-03-09 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. |
2020-02-27 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education. |
2020-02-27 | House | Prefiled. |