LA HB424 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-10-1)
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Effective date: 01/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes income tax incentives for taxpayers related to fostering and adopting certain infants and children (EN -$687,000 GF RV See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes income tax incentives for taxpayers related to fostering and adopting certain infants and children (EN -$687,000 GF RV See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 424 FINAL PASSAGE (#689) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - House - House Vote on HB 424 FINAL PASSAGE (#343) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-16HouseEffective date: 01/01/2022
2021-06-16HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 378.
2021-06-08HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2021-06-06SenateSigned by the President of the Senate on 6/3/2021.
2021-06-03HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2021-06-03HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2021-06-02SenateRead by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2021-05-25SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2021-05-24SenateReported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2021-05-13SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
2021-05-12SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2021-05-11HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2021-05-06HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/11/2021.
2021-05-04HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2021-05-03HouseReported favorably (9-0).
2021-04-12HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
2021-04-02HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/2/2021.
2021-04-01HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
2021-04-01HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=21rs&b=HB424&sbi=y
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1210955
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1219765
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1223320
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1231325
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1235711
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1222905
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1210960
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1213110
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1219998
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1220285
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1223762
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1227142
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1231835
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1238967
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1223302
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1231019

Bill Comments

feedback