LA HB423 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-19 - Effective date: 08/01/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Includes reptile and amphibian wholesale/retail dealers in the trip ticket program

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Includes reptile and amphibian wholesale/retail dealers in the trip ticket program

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-05-10 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 423 FINAL PASSAGE (#693) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - House - House Vote on HB 423 FINAL PASSAGE (#214) (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-19HouseEffective date: 08/01/2016.
2016-05-19HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 114.
2016-05-12HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2016-05-12SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2016-05-11HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2016-05-10HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2016-05-10SenateRead by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2016-05-04SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2016-05-03SenateRead by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2016-05-02SenateReported favorably.
2016-04-07SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources.
2016-04-06SenateReceived in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2016-04-06HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 90, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2016-03-31HouseScheduled for floor debate on 04/06/2016.
2016-03-31HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2016-03-30HouseReported favorably (13-0).
2016-03-14HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
2016-03-04HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2016.
2016-03-03HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
2016-03-03HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback