LA HB422 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-01 - Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-01 - Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Corrects statutory references remaining from the transfer of the State Land Office from the Department of Natural Resources to the Division of Administration
Title
Corrects statutory references remaining from the transfer of the State Land Office from the Department of Natural Resources to the Division of Administration
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-29 - House - House Vote on HB 422 FINAL PASSAGE (#179) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-01 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources. |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2018-03-29 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 91, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2018-03-22 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 03/29/18. |
2018-03-22 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-03-21 | House | Reported with amendments (12-0). |
2018-03-12 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. |
2018-03-02 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. |
2018-03-01 | House | Prefiled. |