LA HB422 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-30 - Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-30 - Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the Payments Toward State Debt Fund as a special treasury fund (EG SEE FISC NOTE GF RV See Note)
Title
Establishes the Payments Toward State Debt Fund as a special treasury fund (EG SEE FISC NOTE GF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-29 - House - House Vote on HB 422 FINAL PASSAGE (#68) (Y: 51 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-30 | House | Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules. |
2016-03-29 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 51, nays 38. Failed to pass, motion to reconsider pending. |
2016-03-24 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 03/29/2016. |
2016-03-23 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2016-03-22 | House | Reported favorably (9-4). |
2016-03-14 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2016-03-04 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2016. |
2016-03-03 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2016-03-03 | House | Prefiled. |