LA HB421 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-11 - Effective date: 08/01/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to bail bond enforcement (EG SEE FISC NOTE SD RV)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to bail bond enforcement (EG SEE FISC NOTE SD RV)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-31 - House - House Vote on HB 421 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#693) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 421 FINAL PASSAGE (#487) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-05-21 - House - House Vote on HB 421 FINAL PASSAGE (#259) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-11HouseEffective date: 08/01/2020.
2020-06-11HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 267.
2020-06-03HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2020-06-01SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2020-06-01SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2020-06-01HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2020-05-31HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 93, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
2020-05-29HouseScheduled for concurrence on 05/31/20.
2020-05-29HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2020-05-28SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2020-05-27SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2020-05-27SenateReported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2020-05-22SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Insurance.
2020-05-21SenateReceived in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2020-05-21HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2020-05-20HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/21/20.
2020-05-15HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2020-05-13HouseReported with amendments (11-0).
2020-03-09HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Insurance.
2020-02-27HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Insurance.
2020-02-27HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=20rs&b=HB421&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1162552
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1172116
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1178594
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1182344
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1171568
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1171530
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1171335
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1172091
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1176904
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1177463
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1178356
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1162565
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1169286
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1172203
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1172750
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1176743
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1175020
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1177206

Bill Comments

feedback