LA HB42 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on June 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-19 - Vetoed by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on June 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-19 - Vetoed by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes payments funded by state retirement system experience accounts to certain retirees and beneficiaries of such systems (REF INCREASE APV)
Title
Authorizes payments funded by state retirement system experience accounts to certain retirees and beneficiaries of such systems (REF INCREASE APV)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-11 - House - House Vote on HB 42 ADOPT CONFERENCE COMMITTEE REPORT (#1130) (Y: 87 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2015-06-11 - House - House Vote on HB 42 ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (#1132) (Y: 87 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2015-06-11 - House - House Vote on HB 42 ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (#1132) (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 93) [PASS]
2015-06-11 - House - House Vote on HB 42 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1130) (Y: 87 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2015-06-11 - House - House Vote on HB 42 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1109) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-06-11 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 42 ADOPT (#1135) (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-11 - House - House Vote on HB 42 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1069) (Y: 77 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2015-06-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 42 FINAL PASSAGE (#945) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-26 - House - House Vote on HB 42 FINAL PASSAGE (#493) (Y: 80 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - House - House Vote on HB 42 BY MAY 14 2015 (#242) (Y: 65 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2015-06-11 - House - House Vote on HB 42 ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (#1132) (Y: 87 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2015-06-11 - House - House Vote on HB 42 ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (#1132) (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 93) [PASS]
2015-06-11 - House - House Vote on HB 42 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1130) (Y: 87 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2015-06-11 - House - House Vote on HB 42 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1109) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-06-11 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 42 ADOPT (#1135) (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-11 - House - House Vote on HB 42 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1069) (Y: 77 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2015-06-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 42 FINAL PASSAGE (#945) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-26 - House - House Vote on HB 42 FINAL PASSAGE (#493) (Y: 80 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - House - House Vote on HB 42 BY MAY 14 2015 (#242) (Y: 65 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-19 | House | Vetoed by the Governor. |
2015-06-15 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/15/2015. |
2015-06-11 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 36 yeas and 1 nays. |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report. |
2015-06-11 | House | Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 87, nays 5. Having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, the Conference Committee Report was adopted. |
2015-06-11 | House | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Senate conference committee members appointed: Guillory, Cortez, and Peacock. |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Notice the House rejected the Senate amendments; House Conference Committee members appointed. |
2015-06-11 | House | House conferees appointed: Jones, Pearson, and Montoucet. |
2015-06-11 | House | Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending. |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Notice House reconsidered Senate amendments. |
2015-06-11 | House | Reconsidered the vote by which the House concurred in the Senate amendments. |
2015-06-11 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 99, nays 0. The Senate amendments, having received a two-thirds vote, were concurred in. |
2015-06-11 | House | Reconsidered the vote by which the House rejected the Senate amendments. |
2015-06-11 | House | Discharged from Conference Committee. |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Notice the House rejected the Senate amendments; House Conference Committee members appointed. |
2015-06-11 | House | House conferees appointed: Jones, Pearson, and Montoucet. |
2015-06-11 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 77, nays 10, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending. |
2015-06-11 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2015-06-10 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 6/11/2015. |
2015-06-10 | House | Notice given. |
2015-06-09 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 6/10/2015. |
2015-06-09 | House | Notice given. |
2015-06-09 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2015-06-08 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 6/09/2015. |
2015-06-08 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2015-06-08 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 1 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2015-06-06 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2015-06-06 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance. |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Senate Committee amendments read and adopted. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Retirement. |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2015-05-26 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 80, nays 20. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2015-05-21 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/26/2015. |
2015-05-19 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2015-05-18 | House | Reported unfavorably (10-0). |
2015-05-06 | House | Directed Retirement Committee to report the bill on 5/14/2015 by a vote of 64 yeas and 25 nays. |
2015-04-13 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Retirement. |
2015-02-27 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/27/2015. |
2015-02-27 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Retirement. |
2015-02-27 | House | Prefiled. |
2015-06-11 | House | Reconsidered. |