LA HB418 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Effective date: 08/01/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to immunity from prosecution for medical marijuana

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to immunity from prosecution for medical marijuana

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-31 - House - House Vote on HB 418 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#692) (Y: 80 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2020-05-29 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 418 FINAL PASSAGE (#584) (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-05-22 - House - House Vote on HB 418 FINAL PASSAGE (#318) (Y: 75 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-09HouseEffective date: 08/01/2020.
2020-06-09HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 147.
2020-06-03HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2020-06-01SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2020-06-01HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2020-05-31HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 80, nays 11, Senate amendments concurred in.
2020-05-29HouseScheduled for concurrence on 05/31/20.
2020-05-29HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2020-05-29SenateRules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 2 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2020-05-28SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2020-05-28SenateReported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2020-05-27SenateRead by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Judiciary C.
2020-05-27SenateRules suspended. Recalled from Committee.
2020-05-25SenateReceived in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2020-05-22HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 75, nays 18. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2020-05-20HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/22/20.
2020-05-18HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2020-05-15HouseReported favorably (10-0).
2020-03-09HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
2020-02-27HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
2020-02-27HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=20rs&b=HB418&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1162545
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1172307
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1175377
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1178595
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1181456
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1175007
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1176383
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1177911
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1178353
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1162562
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1172584
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1175448
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1176855
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1181948
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1185864
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1175358
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1177776

Bill Comments

feedback