LA HB412 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-17 - Involuntarily deferred in committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-17 - Involuntarily deferred in committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the exemption of certain Louisiana residents from the crime of illegal carrying of weapons when the firearm is legally obtained, manufactured, and possessed
Title
Provides relative to the exemption of certain Louisiana residents from the crime of illegal carrying of weapons when the firearm is legally obtained, manufactured, and possessed
Sponsors
Rep. Barry Ivey [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-17 | House | Involuntarily deferred in committee. |
2018-03-12 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2018-03-02 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2018-03-01 | House | Prefiled. |