LA HB412 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-31 - Effective date: May 31, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-31 - Effective date: May 31, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Statutorily substitute the city of Bunkie, in lieu of a certain population range, as the taxing authority authorized to levy and collect a hotel occupancy tax
Title
Statutorily substitute the city of Bunkie, in lieu of a certain population range, as the taxing authority authorized to levy and collect a hotel occupancy tax
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-23 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 412, FINAL PASSAGE (#1342) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-04-26 - House - House Vote on HB 412, FINAL PASSAGE (#544) (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2012-04-26 - House - House Vote on HB 412, FINAL PASSAGE (#544) (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-31 | Effective date: May 31, 2012. | |
2012-05-31 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 390. | |
2012-05-29 | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. | |
2012-05-28 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2012-05-24 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2012-05-23 | Received from the Senate without amendments. | |
2012-05-23 | Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2012-05-22 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2012-05-21 | Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2012-04-30 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs. | |
2012-04-26 | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | |
2012-04-26 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 90, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |
2012-04-18 | Scheduled for floor debate on 4/26/2012. | |
2012-04-17 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - local and consent calendar. | |
2012-04-16 | Reported favorably (15-0-1) (Local and Consent). | |
2012-03-12 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. | |
2012-03-03 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/2/2012. | |
2012-02-29 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. | |
2012-02-29 | Prefiled. |