LA HB408 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-8-1)
Status: Passed on June 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-12 - Effective date: 06/12/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-8-1)
Status: Passed on June 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-12 - Effective date: 06/12/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts certain research and development tax credit recipients from detailed examinations by the Department of Economic Development (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)
Title
Exempts certain research and development tax credit recipients from detailed examinations by the Department of Economic Development (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-06 - House - House Vote on HB 408 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1079) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-06-04 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 408 CO-AUTHORS (#777) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 28) [PASS]
2023-06-04 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 408 FINAL PASSAGE (#776) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - House - House Vote on HB 408 FINAL PASSAGE (#474) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-06-04 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 408 CO-AUTHORS (#777) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 28) [PASS]
2023-06-04 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 408 FINAL PASSAGE (#776) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - House - House Vote on HB 408 FINAL PASSAGE (#474) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-12 | House | Effective date: 06/12/2023. |
2023-06-12 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 350. |
2023-06-07 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2023-06-07 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2023-06-06 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 98, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2023-06-05 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 06/06/2023. |
2023-06-05 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2023-06-04 | Senate | Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2023-05-29 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2023-05-26 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2023-05-17 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2023-05-11 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/17/2023. |
2023-05-09 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2023-05-08 | House | Reported with amendments (15-0). |
2023-04-10 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2023-04-03 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/3/2023. |
2023-03-30 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2023-03-30 | House | Prefiled. |