LA HB408 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-28 - Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-28 - Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Revises the business corporation laws (RE1 INCREASE SG EX See Note)
Title
Revises the business corporation laws (RE1 INCREASE SG EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-28 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 408 HB 408 BY FOIL (#705) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-13 - House - House Vote on HB 408 FINAL PASSAGE (#387) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2013-05-13 - House - House Vote on HB 408 FINAL PASSAGE (#387) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-28 | Senate | Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance. |
2013-05-27 | Senate | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs. |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2013-05-13 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 91, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2013-05-13 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2013-05-06 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/13/2013. |
2013-05-06 | House | Notice given. |
2013-04-22 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2013-04-17 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 4/22/2013. |
2013-04-17 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. |
2013-04-16 | House | Reported with amendments (16-0) (Regular). |
2013-04-08 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce. |
2013-04-01 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/1/2013. |
2013-03-28 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce. |
2013-03-28 | House | Prefiled. |