LA HB407 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-08 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-08 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
(Constitutional Amendment) Provides relative to prefiling and consideration of certain legislation at regular sessions
Title
(Constitutional Amendment) Provides relative to prefiling and consideration of certain legislation at regular sessions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-07 - House - House Vote on HB 407 FINAL PASSAGE (#290) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-08 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2013-05-07 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2013-04-30 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/7/2013. |
2013-04-30 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered reengrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. |
2013-04-29 | House | Reported with amendments (12-0) (Regular). |
2013-04-25 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2013-04-24 | House | Reported with amendments (9-0) (Regular). To be recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2013-04-08 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2013-04-01 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/1/2013. |
2013-03-28 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2013-03-28 | House | Prefiled. |