LA HB406 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-24 - Becomes HB 1275.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-24 - Becomes HB 1275.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the consideration of certain provider impact issues and issuance of a provider impact statement prior to the adoption, amendment, or repeal of rules by a state agency
Title
Requires the consideration of certain provider impact issues and issuance of a provider impact statement prior to the adoption, amendment, or repeal of rules by a state agency
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-24 | House | Becomes HB 1275. |
2014-04-23 | House | Reported by substitute (8-0). |
2014-03-10 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2014-02-26 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2014-02-26 | House | Prefiled. |