LA HB404 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-10 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
Pending: Senate Local & Municipal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-10 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
Pending: Senate Local & Municipal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to per diem paid to commissioners of Tangipahoa Parish Recreation District No. 3
Title
Provides relative to per diem paid to commissioners of Tangipahoa Parish Recreation District No. 3
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-09 - House - House Vote on HB 404 FINAL PASSAGE (#326) (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-10 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs. |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2018-04-09 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 87, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2018-04-02 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/09/18. |
2018-04-02 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-03-29 | House | Reported favorably (16-0). |
2018-03-12 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. |
2018-03-02 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. |
2018-03-01 | House | Prefiled. |